Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert Rivas, O.P.

Archbishop of Castries, Saint Lucia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1946 BornArima
17 Jun 197125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Oct 198943.4AppointedBishop of Kingstown, Saint Vincent and Grenadines, Antilles
22 Jan 199043.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kingstown, Saint Vincent and Grenadines, Antilles
19 Jul 200761.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles
15 Feb 200861.7SucceededArchbishop of Castries, Saint Lucia, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Robert Rivas:
Archbishop Robert Rivas O.P. (born ) Archbishop of Castries

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Castries.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jul 2007
  • s: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,778

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013