Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kenneth David Oswin Richards

Archbishop of Kingston in Jamaica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1958 BornLinstead, St. Catherine
29 Sep 198527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles
19 Nov 201153.2AppointedBishop of Saint John’s-Basseterre, Virgin Islands (British), Antilles
8 Feb 201253.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint John’s-Basseterre, Virgin Islands (British), Antilles
29 Apr 201657.7AppointedArchbishop of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Kenneth David Oswin Richards
Archbishop Kenneth David Oswin Richards (born ) Archbishop of Kingston in Jamaica

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kingston in Jamaica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2011
  • ob: CB, 26 Nov 2011
  • c2+: CB, 9 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,252
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Apr 2016