Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Derek Persaud

Bishop of Mandeville, Jamaica, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1956 Born
14 Jul 198528.8Ordained PriestPriest of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles
19 Jun 202063.8AppointedBishop of Mandeville, Jamaica, Antilles
19 Sep 202064.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mandeville, Jamaica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for John Derek Persaud
Bishop John Derek Persaud (born ) Bishop of Mandeville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGeorgetown, Diocese of Georgetown, Guyana
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mandeville, Diocese of Mandeville, Jamaica

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mandeville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Jul 2020
  • ob: CB, 16 Jul 2020
  • c2+: CB, 19 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast