Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Samuel Emmanuel Carter, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston in Jamaica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1919BornKingston
19 Jun 195434.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1 Feb 196646.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles
1 Feb 196646.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenculiana
25 Apr 196646.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenculiana
1 Sep 197051.1AppointedArchbishop of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles
11 Nov 199475.3RetiredArchbishop of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles
3 Sep 200283.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Samuel Emmanuel Carter:
Archbishop Samuel Emmanuel Carter S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston in Jamaica

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 22 Feb 2014