Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Christopher Pinder

Archbishop of Nassau, Bahamas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1953 BornNassau
15 Aug 198026.7Ordained PriestPriest of Nassau, Bahamas, Antilles
27 Jun 200349.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nassau, Bahamas, Antilles
27 Jun 200349.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Calanae
15 Aug 200349.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Calanae
17 Feb 200450.2AppointedArchbishop of Nassau, Bahamas, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Patrick Christopher Pinder:
Archbishop Patrick Christopher Pinder (born ) Archbishop of Nassau

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Nassau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,436

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015