Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Sydney Nicasio

Bishop of Belize City-Belmopan, Belize, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1956 Born
1988²31.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Belize
16 Jun 198932.7Ordained PriestPriest of Belize
26 Jan 201760.3AppointedBishop of Belize City-Belmopan, Belize, Antilles
13 May 201760.6Ordained BishopBishop of Belize City-Belmopan, Belize, Antilles

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Sydney Nicasio
Bishop Lawrence Sydney Nicasio (born ) Bishop of Belize City-Belmopan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDangriga, Diocese of Belize
Ordained PriestCathedral, Belize, Diocese of Belize
Ordained BishopGymnasium, Saint John's College, Belize City, Diocese of Belize City-Belmopan, Belize

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Belize City-Belmopan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2017
  • ob/c1: CB, 22 Feb 2017
  • c2+: CB, 13 May 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast