Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Léon Kalenga Badikebele

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Argentina

Titular Archbishop of Magnetum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1956Born
5 Sep 198226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Luebo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Mar 200851.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ghana
1 Mar 200851.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Magnetum
1 May 200851.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Magnetum
22 Feb 201356.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to El Salvador
13 Apr 201356.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belize, Antilles
17 Mar 201861.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina
12 Jun 201962.9DiedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina

MicroData Summary for Léon Kalenga Badikebele (VIAF: 51006423)
Archbishop Léon Kalenga Badikebele (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Argentina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,733
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Mar 2018
  • d: CB, 12 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast