Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oswaldo Estéfano Escobar Aguilar, O.C.D.

Bishop of Chalatenango


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1968 BornChiapas
Dec 1995³27.5Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
19 Mar 199627.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
14 Jul 201648.1AppointedBishop of Chalatenango, El Salvador
1 Oct 201648.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chalatenango, El Salvador

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Oswaldo Estéfano Escobar Aguilar
Bishop Oswaldo Estéfano Escobar Aguilar O.C.D. (born ) Bishop of Chalatenango

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chalatenango.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2016
  • ob: CB, 30 Jul 2016
  • c2+: CB, 13 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Oct 2016