Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romeo Tovar Astorga, O.F.M.

Bishop of Santa Ana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1940 BornCiudad Delgado
25 Jun 196828.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
5 May 198747.1AppointedBishop of Zacatecoluca, El Salvador
25 Jul 198747.3Ordained BishopBishop of Zacatecoluca, El Salvador
17 Dec 199656.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Miguel, El Salvador
10 Apr 199757.0SucceededBishop of San Miguel, El Salvador
12 May 199959.1AppointedBishop of Santa Ana, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Romeo Tovar Astorga:
Bishop Romeo Tovar Astorga O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Santa Ana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Ana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015