Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Elías Rauda Gutiérrez, O.F.M.

Bishop of San Vicente, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1962 Born
28 Feb 198724.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
1 Apr 198926.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
25 Jan 200845.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Ana, El Salvador
25 Jan 200845.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Foratiana
19 Apr 200845.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Foratiana
12 Dec 200947.3AppointedBishop of San Vicente, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for José Elías Rauda Gutiérrez
Bishop José Elías Rauda Gutiérrez O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of San Vicente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgua Caliente

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Vicente.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,729
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast