Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvio José Báez Ortega, O.C.D.

Auxiliary Bishop of Managua, Nicaragua

Titular Bishop of Zica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1958 Born
1979²20.6EnteredMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
15 Jan 198526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
9 Apr 200950.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Managua, Nicaragua
9 Apr 200950.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Zica
30 May 200951.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zica

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Silvio José Báez Ortega (VIAF: 248592653)
Bishop Silvio José Báez Ortega O.C.D. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Managua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMasaya, Archdiocese of Managua
Ordained PriestSan Ramón, Diocese of Alajuela, Costa Rica
Ordained BishopCathedral, Managua, Archdiocese of Managua

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Managua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,181
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2019, Page 1,001

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Mar 2019

Quantcast