Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Leopoldo José Cardinal Brenes Solórzano

Archbishop of Managua, Nicaragua

Cardinal-Priest of San Gioacchino ai Prati di Castello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1949 Born
13 Jan 197424.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Managua, Nicaragua
16 Aug 197425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Managua, Nicaragua
13 Feb 198838.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Managua, Nicaragua
13 Feb 198838.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Maturba
19 Mar 198839.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maturba
2 Nov 199142.6AppointedBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
1 Apr 200556.0AppointedArchbishop of Managua, Nicaragua
21 May 200556.2InstalledArchbishop of Managua, Nicaragua
22 Feb 201464.9Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201464.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Gioacchino ai Prati di Castello
5 Oct 201465.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Gioacchino ai Prati di Castello

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo José Brenes Solórzano
Leopoldo José Cardinal Brenes Solórzano (born ) Archbishop of Managua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTicuantepe

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Managua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,338
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • i: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Mar 2019

Quantcast