Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Enrique Herrera Gutiérrez, O.F.M.

Bishop of Jinotega


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1948 BornManagua
7 Jan 198031.0Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
10 Jan 198233.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
10 May 200556.4AppointedBishop of Jinotega, Nicaragua
24 Jun 200556.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jinotega, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Carlos Enrique Herrera Gutiérrez:
Bishop Carlos Enrique Herrera Gutiérrez O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Jinotega

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jinotega.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,901

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013