Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julián Luis Barni Spotti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of León en Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1914BornMonza, Italy
27 Apr 194126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
14 Aug 196247.8AppointedPrelate of Juigalpa, Nicaragua
14 Aug 196247.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Coracesium
16 Sep 196247.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coracesium
22 Jun 197055.6AppointedBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
18 Jun 198267.6AppointedBishop of León en Nicaragua
2 Apr 199176.4RetiredBishop of León en Nicaragua
15 Nov 199480.0DiedBishop Emeritus of León en Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Julián Luis Barni Spotti:
Bishop Julián Luis Barni Spotti O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of León en Nicaragua

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1992, Page 367
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013