Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos de la Trinidad Borge y Castrillo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Managua

Titular Bishop of Lappa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1888BornIuigalpa
28 Oct 191426.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 194556.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Granada, Nicaragua
14 Apr 194556.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lappa
27 May 194557.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lappa
9 Aug 195365.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Managua, Nicaragua
17 Jun 196880.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Managua, Nicaragua
22 Jul 197385.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Managua, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Carlos de la Trinidad Borge y Castrillo:
Bishop Carlos de la Trinidad Borge y Castrillo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Managua

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013