Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Paul Odendahl Metz, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Limón, Costa Rica

Titular Bishop of Latopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1888Born
15 Feb 191425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
10 Feb 193849.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Limón, Costa Rica
10 Feb 193849.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Latopolis
25 Apr 193849.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Latopolis
13 Jan 195768.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Limón, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Johann Paul Odendahl Metz
Bishop Johann Paul Odendahl Metz C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Limón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln, Germany

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018