Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Juan Solís Fernández

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alajuela

Titular Bishop of Thucca in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1892BornHeredia
22 Aug 191523.0Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
3 Jul 194047.9AppointedBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica
18 Aug 194048.0Ordained BishopBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica
18 Mar 196774.6RetiredBishop of Alajuela, Costa Rica
18 Mar 196774.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Numidia
16 Jan 197380.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Alajuela, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Vicente Juan Solís Fernández:
Bishop Vicente Juan Solís Fernández (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alajuela

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013