Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Delfín Quesada Castro

Deceased

Bishop of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1908Born
20 Dec 193123.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Oct 195446.6AppointedBishop of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica
18 Jan 195546.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica
17 Oct 197466.6DiedBishop of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Delfín Quesada Castro
Bishop Delfín Quesada Castro (born , died ) Bishop of San Isidro de El General

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pedro de Poás

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018