Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Humberto Rodríguez Quirós

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of San José de Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1910BornSan José de Costa Rica
25 Oct 193626.5Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
5 May 196050.0AppointedArchbishop of San José de Costa Rica
26 May 196050.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of San José de Costa Rica
24 Mar 197968.9ResignedArchbishop of San José de Costa Rica
23 Jul 198676.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of San José de Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Carlos Humberto Rodríguez Quirós:
Archbishop Carlos Humberto Rodríguez Quirós (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of San José de Costa Rica

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013