Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gennaro Verolino

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission for Sacred Archeology

Titular Archbishop of Corinthus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1906BornNapoli, Italy
23 Dec 192822.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 195144.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
5 Sep 195144.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to El Salvador
5 Sep 195144.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guatemala
7 Oct 195144.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
25 Feb 195750.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
2 Mar 196356.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Ceremonies
15 Aug 196760.8AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
16 Apr 196962.5AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Sacred Archeology
1986²79.2RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Sacred Archeology
17 Nov 200599.0DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission for Sacred Archeology

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Verolino:
Archbishop Gennaro Verolino (born , died ) President Emeritus of Sacred Archeology

  • a priest for 76.9 years
  • a bishop for 54.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ab/sect/x932: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 55, Page 253
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 106
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013