Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco De Pietro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acerra, Italy

Titular Bishop of Calynda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1844Born
6 Jun 186823.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 189955.1AppointedBishop of Acerra, Italy
17 Dec 189955.1Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
28 Jan 193287.3RetiredBishop of Acerra, Italy
28 Jan 193287.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Calynda
22 Jan 193489.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Acerra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco De Pietro
Bishop Francesco De Pietro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Acerra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 72
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 34
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017