Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Costantino Cristiano Luna Pianegonda, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zacapa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1910BornRecoaro Terme
1 Jul 193423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 Nov 195544.9AppointedBishop of Zacapa, Guatemala
6 Jan 195645.0Ordained BishopBishop of Zacapa, Guatemala
16 Feb 198069.1ResignedBishop of Zacapa, Guatemala
1 Sep 199786.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Zacapa, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Costantino Cristiano Luna Pianegonda:
Bishop Costantino Cristiano Luna Pianegonda O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zacapa

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015