Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas

Dioecesis Zacapensis y de Esquipulas



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 24 June 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Guatemala
  • Square Kilometers: 5,598 (2,162 Square Miles)
  • Basilica de Esquipulas: http://basilicadeesquipulas.org/
  • Mailing Address: Casa Episcopal, 12 Calle A 0-56, Zona 1, 19001 Zacapa, Guatemala; Basilica de Esquipulas, 20007 Esquípulas, Depto. Chiquimula, Guatemala
  • Telephone: 7941.01.53; 7720.70.50
  • Fax: 7941.08.88; 7943.13.81

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Zacapa
10 March 1951ErectedArchdiocese of Guatemala Diocese of Zacapa (erected)
16 September 1956Territory LostDiocese of Zacapa Territorial Prelature of Santo Cristo de Esquipulas (erected)
30 April 1968Territory LostDiocese of Zacapa Apostolic Administration of Izabal (erected)
Diocese of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas
24 June 1986Name ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Santo Cristo de Esquipulas
Diocese of Zacapa
Diocese of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Zacapa
1966450,000500,00090.0%6283413,235133420ap1967
1970233,500250,02593.4%1414288,3391205514ap1971
1976233,500264,97288.1%1213259,3402253415ap1977
1980251,600284,50088.4%12122410,4832193918ap1981
Diocese of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas
1990343,000390,50087.8%10122215,5902234520ap1991
1999408,000480,00085.0%17102715,1111234722ap2000
2000419,400493,40085.0%23103312,7091244825ap2001
2001438,000516,00084.9%26103612,1661184925ap2002
2002408,000480,00085.0%21113212,7501124723ap2003
2003442,200535,00082.7%18234110,7851445929ap2004
2004436,000547,00079.7%16183412,8231384728ap2005
2010514,000617,50083.2%24164012,8501346724ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013