Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Aníbal Casasola Sosa

Deceased

Bishop of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1949BornLa Unión
5 Nov 197728.0Ordained PriestPriest of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas, Guatemala
25 Jul 200151.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas, Guatemala
13 May 200454.5AppointedBishop of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas, Guatemala
26 Jun 200454.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas, Guatemala
27 Apr 200757.5DiedBishop of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for José Aníbal Casasola Sosa:
Bishop José Aníbal Casasola Sosa (born , died ) Bishop of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,613
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013