Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Edgar Cabrera Ovalle

Bishop Emeritus of Jalapa, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1939 Born
1 Dec 196324.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 198647.1AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz del Quiché, Guatemala
6 Jan 198747.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz del Quiché, Guatemala
5 Dec 200162.2AppointedBishop of Jalapa, Guatemala
30 Mar 202080.6RetiredBishop of Jalapa, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Julio Edgar Cabrera Ovalle
Bishop Julio Edgar Cabrera Ovalle (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Jalapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Juan Comalapa
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jalapa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Mar 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,770

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Jul 2021

Quantcast