Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Peñate Rodríguez

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Izabal, Guatemala

Titular Bishop of Succuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1957 Born
18 Dec 198427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Jalapa, Guatemala
21 May 200446.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Izabal, Guatemala
21 May 200446.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Succuba
14 Aug 200446.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Succuba
26 Jul 201153.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Izabal, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Peñate Rodríguez
Bishop Gabriel Peñate Rodríguez (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Izabal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Esmeralda

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Izabal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,673
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast