Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Alberto Molina Palma, O.A.R.

Archbishop of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1948 BornPanamá, Panama
27 Aug 196819.8ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
28 Aug 197122.8Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
29 Jun 197526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
29 Oct 200456.0AppointedBishop of Quiché, Guatemala
22 Jan 200556.2Ordained BishopBishop of Quiché, Guatemala
14 Jul 201162.7AppointedArchbishop of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán, Guatemala
17 Sep 201162.9InstalledArchbishop of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Mario Alberto Molina Palma:
Archbishop Mario Alberto Molina Palma O.A.R. (born ) Archbishop of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,811
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2011
  • i: CB, 25 Jul 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015