Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Los Altos Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán

Archidioecesis Altensis, Quetzltenanguensis-Totonicapensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Erected: 13 February 1996
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Guatemala
  • Square Kilometers: 3,012 (1,163 Square Miles)
  • Web Site: http://www.riial.org/guatemala/destalt.htm
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 11, 11a Av. 6-27, Zona 1, 09001 Quetzaltenango, Guatemala
  • Telephone: 761.28.40
  • Fax: 761.60.49

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos
27 July 1921ErectedArchdiocese of Guatemala Diocese of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos (erected)
10 March 1951Territory LostDiocese of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos Diocese of San Marcos (erected)
10 March 1951Territory LostArchdiocese of Guatemala
Diocese of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos
Diocese of Sololá (erected)
Archdiocese of Los Altos Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán
13 February 1996ErectedDiocese of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos Archdiocese of Los Altos Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán (erected) (Name Changed and Diocese raised to an Archdiocese)
31 December 1996Territory LostArchdiocese of Los Altos Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán Diocese of Suchitepéquez-Retalhuleu (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos
1949700,0001,018,07968.8%10273718,918232335ap1951
1966510,000550,00092.7%2338618,360309726ap1967
1968193,494203,67795.0%2027474,11624410927ap1971
1976585,000650,00090.0%27305710,2633612429ap1977
1980626,000710,00088.2%22264813,0413112530ap1981
1990858,000960,00089.4%26194519,0664616133ap1991
Archdiocese of Los Altos Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán
1999960,0001,200,00080.0%23204322,3253012627ap2000
2000975,0001,200,00081.3%24224621,1953413029ap2001
2001979,0001,205,00081.2%24244820,3953413028ap2002
2002990,0001,260,00078.6%25255019,8004813028ap2003
20031,002,8001,272,80078.8%26224820,8915110128ap2004
20041,016,0001,270,00080.0%29245319,1695711828ap2005
20101,123,0001,404,00080.0%30225221,59616610034ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013