Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Huehuetenango

Dioecesis Gerontopolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Huehuetenango
22 July 1961ErectedDiocese of San Marcos Territorial Prelature of Huehuetenango (erected)
Diocese of Huehuetenango
23 December 1967ErectedTerritorial Prelature of Huehuetenango Diocese of Huehuetenango (erected)
13 February 1996Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Huehuetenango (from Guatemala)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Huehuetenango
1966300,000310,00096.8%137387,894136522ap1967
Diocese of Huehuetenango
1970308,000349,35288.2%528339,333377520ap1971
1976325,000368,80788.1%6182413,541275920ap1977
1980351,000397,80088.2%12152713,000255820ap1981
1990420,000525,00080.0%1051528,000125719ap1991
1999508,065714,37971.1%1822025,40375731ap2000
2000524,895731,20971.8%1822026,24465931ap2001
2001544,091750,40572.5%1912027,20455731ap2002
2002547,778754,09272.6%2012126,08455031ap2003
2003565,832772,14673.3%2112225,71955031ap2004
2004583,390772,14675.6%2122325,36464431ap2005
2006615,895822,20974.9%2422623,68864431ap2007
2010690,519896,83377.0%2522725,57464531ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.9, 28 May 2012; data: 24 Jun 2012