Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Marcos

Dioecesis Sancti Marci in Guatimala



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
10 March 1951ErectedDiocese of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos Diocese of San Marcos (erected)
22 July 1961Territory LostDiocese of San Marcos Territorial Prelature of Huehuetenango (erected)
13 February 1996Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of San Marcos (from Guatemala)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966291,660332,30387.8%25741,6655417ap1967
1970313,656332,30394.4%2232512,54634923ap1971
1976315,000388,10081.2%2342711,66647522ap1977
1980364,000416,00087.5%2522713,48129022ap1981
1990700,000800,00087.5%1642035,00073629ap1991
1999810,000900,00090.0%1872532,40093929ap2000
2000650,254844,48677.0%2262823,22372330ap2001
2001655,254844,48777.6%2272922,594199230ap2002
2002680,534900,18775.6%2773420,015199930ap2003
2003715,704900,28379.5%3374017,8921911330ap2004
2010595,000862,00069.0%3584313,8371107930ap2011
2014652,000950,00068.6%3474115,90289230ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 25 May 2015