Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Próspero Penados del Barrio

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1925Born
24 Mar 195125.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 196640.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Marcos, Guatemala
28 Jul 196640.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Turres Ammeniae
19 Nov 196641.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turres Ammeniae
7 Dec 197146.2AppointedBishop of San Marcos, Guatemala
1 Dec 198358.2AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
19 Jun 200175.8RetiredArchbishop of Guatemala
13 May 200579.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Próspero Penados del Barrio
Archbishop Próspero Penados del Barrio (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiudad Flores

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast