Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Enrique Trinidad Gómez

Deceased

Bishop of San Marcos, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1955Born
22 Dec 198429.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
4 Nov 201459.6AppointedBishop of San Marcos, Guatemala
31 Jan 201559.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Marcos, Guatemala
9 May 201863.1DiedBishop of San Marcos, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Carlos Enrique Trinidad Gómez
Bishop Carlos Enrique Trinidad Gómez (born , died ) Bishop of San Marcos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuatemala City, Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala
Ordained BishopColegio La Asunción, San Marcos, Diocese of San Marcos
Death PlaceQuetzaltenango

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 24 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,358
  • d: CB, 9 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 10 May 2018

Quantcast