Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolas Henry Marie Denis Thevenin

Apostolic Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of

Titular Archbishop of Aeclanum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1958 Born
4 Jul 198931.0Ordained PriestPriest of Genova-Bobbio, Italy
15 Dec 201254.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aeclanum
15 Dec 201254.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio
5 Jan 201354.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guatemala
6 Jan 201354.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aeclanum
4 Nov 201961.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Henry Marie Denis Thevenin
Archbishop Nicolas Henry Marie Denis Thevenin (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Egypt, Arab Republic of

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Disier, France
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Egypt, Arab Republic of.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2012
  • c34: CB, 3 Jan 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,627
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast