Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Thomas Halim Habib

Bishop-Elect of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1963 Born
27 Mar 199430.7Ordained PriestPriest of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
3 Nov 202057.3AppointedBishop of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt
23 Jan 202157.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Thomas Halim Habib
Father Thomas Halim Habib (born ) Bishop-Elect of Sohag

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSohag, Eparchy of Sohag (Coptic)
Ordained BishopSohag, Eparchy of Sohag (Coptic)

Please contact the Father through the Eparchy of Sohag (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast