Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Toma Adly Zaki

Bishop of Guizeh (Coptic), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1966 Born
20 Apr 200134.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 201851.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Guizeh (Coptic), Egypt
10 Apr 201851.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cabasa
25 May 201851.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cabasa
25 Mar 201952.3AppointedBishop of Guizeh (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Toma Adly Zaki
Bishop Toma Adly Zaki (born ) Bishop of Guizeh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinia
Ordained BishopCoptic, Cathedral, Guizeh, Eparchy of Guizeh (Coptic)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Guizeh (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Apr 2018
  • c3+: CB, 25 May 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,781
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 Mar 2019

Quantcast