Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ibrahim Isaac Sedrak (Sidrak)

Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1955 Born
7 Feb 198024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic), Egypt
29 Sep 200247.1SelectedBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
5 Oct 200247.1ConfirmedBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
15 Nov 200247.2Ordained BishopBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
15 Jan 201357.4SelectedPatriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
18 Jan 201357.4ConfirmedPatriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
18 Jan 201357.4AppointedBishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
23 Jan 201761.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Guizeh (Coptic), Egypt
10 Apr 201862.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Guizeh (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Ibrahim Isaac Sedrak (Sidrak) (VIAF: 30145909991327020646)
Patriarch Ibrahim Isaac Sedrak (Sidrak) (born ) Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeni-Chokeir
Ordained BishopCathedral, Minya, Eparchy of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic)

Please contact the Patriarch through the Patriarchate of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,280
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 9 Oct 2019

Quantcast