Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Makarios Tewfik

Bishop of Ismayliah (Coptic)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1945 BornKotna
10 Sep 197227.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 199449.1AppointedBishop of Ismayliah (Coptic), Egypt
22 Jul 199449.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ismayliah (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Makarios Tewfik:
Bishop Makarios Tewfik (born ) Bishop of Ismayliah

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Ismayliah (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,429
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013