Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Lotfy Khella

Bishop of Ismayliah (Coptic), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1969 Born
18 Jul 199627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic), Egypt
Jun 2019³50.0SelectedBishop of Ismayliah (Coptic), Egypt
29 Jun 201950.1ConfirmedBishop of Ismayliah (Coptic), Egypt
5 Sep 201950.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ismayliah (Coptic), Egypt

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel Lotfy Khella
Bishop Daniel Lotfy Khella (born ) Bishop of Ismayliah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaja Rezeeq, Eparchy of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic)
Ordained BishopSaint Mark, Cathedral, Ismayliah, Eparchy of Ismayliah (Coptic)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Ismayliah (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2019
  • bp/opd/c1: CB, 29 Jun 2019
  • fn/ob: CB, 7 Jul 2019
  • c2+: CB, 5 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast