Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel (Khaled Ayad) Bishay

Bishop of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1972 Born
25 Sep 199523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt
16 Apr 201644.2ConfirmedBishop of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt
10 Jun 201644.4Ordained BishopBishop of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel (Khaled Ayad) Bishay
Bishop Emmanuel (Khaled Ayad) Bishay (born ) Bishop of Luqsor {Tebe}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKom Gharg

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 16 Apr 2016
  • c2+: CB, 10 Jun 2016
  • rm c9: CB, 14 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,935

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 May 2018

Quantcast