Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hani Nassif Wasef Bakhoum Kiroulos

Curial Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

Titular Bishop of Cabasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1974 Born
29 Dec 200430.6Ordained PriestPriest of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
14 Jun 201945.1ConfirmedCurial Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
14 Jun 201945.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cabasa
31 Aug 201945.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cabasa

MicroData Summary for Hani Nassif Wasef Bakhoum Kiroulos
Bishop Hani Nassif Wasef Bakhoum Kiroulos (born ) Curial Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCairo, Patriarchate of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic)
Ordained BishopOur Lady, Cathedral, Nasr City, Patriarchate of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic)

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2019
  • ob: CB, 14 Jun 2019
  • c2+: CB, 31 Aug 2019
  • c2+: CB, 1 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 Sep 2019

Quantcast