Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basilios Fawzy Al-Dabe

Bishop of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1956 Born
28 Mar 198023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
Jun 2019³62.4SelectedBishop of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt
14 Jun 201962.4ConfirmedBishop of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt
3 Aug 201962.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Basilios Fawzy Al-Dabe
Bishop Basilios Fawzy Al-Dabe (born ) Bishop of Sohag

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinya, Eparchy of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic)
Ordained BishopJésus le Roi, Cathedral, Tahta, Eparchy of Sohag (Coptic)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Sohag (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2019
  • bp/c1/ob: CB, 14 Jun 2019
  • c2+: CB, 3 Aug 2019
  • c9: CB, 31 Aug 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 9 Oct 2019

Quantcast