Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Youhanna Golta

Curial Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic)

Titular Bishop of Andropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1937 BornKotna
25 Sep 196023.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 198649.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
27 Jul 198649.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Andropolis
29 Aug 198649.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Andropolis
199759.9AppointedCurial Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Youhanna Golta:
Bishop Youhanna Golta (born ) Curial Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,246
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013