Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Youhanna Nueir, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1914BornAl Fayum
13 Jun 194328.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
8 Dec 195541.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt
8 Dec 195541.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Phatanus
29 Jan 195641.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phatanus
26 Mar 196550.5AppointedBishop of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic), Egypt
20 Mar 199075.5RetiredBishop of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic), Egypt
13 Aug 199580.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Youhanna Nueir:
Bishop Youhanna Nueir O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Assiut {Lycopolis}

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015