Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodolfo Valenzuela Núñez

Bishop of Verapaz, Cobán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1954 BornQuetzaltenango
28 Jun 198026.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 199742.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala
19 Apr 199742.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala
22 Feb 200146.7SucceededBishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Rodolfo Valenzuela Núñez:
Bishop Rodolfo Valenzuela Núñez (born ) Bishop of Verapaz, Cobán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Verapaz, Cobán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,993
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 778

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013