Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Humberto Flores Reyes

Bishop Emeritus of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1925 Born
17 Dec 194924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala
26 Jul 196640.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala
26 Jul 196640.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Caesaris
7 Oct 196640.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Caesaris
9 May 196943.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Izabal, Guatemala
7 Oct 197751.8AppointedBishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala
17 Dec 197752.0InstalledBishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala
22 Feb 200175.2RetiredBishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Humberto Flores Reyes
Bishop Gerardo Humberto Flores Reyes (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Verapaz, Cobán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuezaltenango

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Verapaz, Cobán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017