Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Humberto Lara Mejía, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Cruz del Quiché, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1917Born
8 Nov 194225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
19 Jul 195740.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Verapaz, Cobán, Guatemala
19 Jul 195740.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Traianopolis in Phrygia
27 Oct 195740.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Traianopolis in Phrygia
5 May 196750.2AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz del Quiché, Guatemala
9 Jun 197255.3DiedBishop of Santa Cruz del Quiché, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Humberto Lara Mejía
Bishop Humberto Lara Mejía C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Cruz del Quiché

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuatemala

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast