Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Beckmann, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1883Born
13 Jul 191329.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
25 May 194056.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Panamá
25 May 194056.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Telmissus
7 Jul 194056.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Telmissus
13 Jan 194561.4AppointedArchbishop of Panamá
30 Oct 196380.2DiedArchbishop of Panamá

MicroData Summary for Francisco Beckmann
Archbishop Francisco Beckmann C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Panamá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEnschede, Netherlands

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017