Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Carrizo Villarreal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chitré


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1918BornOcú
20 Dec 194224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Panamá
21 Jan 196344.5AppointedBishop of Chitré, Panama
24 Mar 196344.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chitré, Panama
29 Oct 199476.2RetiredBishop of Chitré, Panama
15 Apr 199879.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Chitré, Panama

MicroData Summary for José María Carrizo Villarreal:
Bishop José María Carrizo Villarreal (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chitré

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013