Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Enrique Núñez Núñez

Deceased

Bishop of David


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1927BornOcú
19 Jul 195326.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 196437.0AppointedBishop of David, Panama
2 Aug 196437.2Ordained BishopBishop of David, Panama
11 Jan 199971.6DiedBishop of David, Panama

MicroData Summary for Daniel Enrique Núñez Núñez:
Bishop Daniel Enrique Núñez Núñez (born , died ) Bishop of David

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015