Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonino Pinci

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Panama

Titular Archbishop of Tarasa in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1912BornCave
29 Jun 193624.4Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 196149.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarasa in Numidia
31 Oct 196149.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
17 Dec 196149.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarasa in Numidia
197158.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
16 Aug 198775.5DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Panama

MicroData Summary for Antonino Pinci:
Archbishop Antonino Pinci (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Panama

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013